Gaming

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0032Amusement Devices - Free-Play Pinball Machines - Use by MinorsDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0085Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0090
    (SB0496)
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee PaymentsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0091
    (SB0495 / CH0339)
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of OwnershipChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0092
    (SB0498)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0093
    (SB0497)
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal TermChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0194 / CH0048
    (SB0101 / CH0047)
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0300Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0377
    (SB0940)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Gaming (C7)
HB0545Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - BingoCarroll County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0645
    (SB0518 / CH0075)
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of OperationFrederick County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0811
    (SB0663)
Allegany County and Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact GrantsDelegate BuckelIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationGaming (C7)
HB0989Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and ImplementationDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1138
    (SB1152)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational FacilitiesDelegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1227The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate MosbyIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1230Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal OrganizationsDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1497Video Lottery Operations - Persons on Voluntary Exclusion List - TrespassDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1563Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grant DistributionDelegate KnottsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsGaming (C7)
SB0101 / CH0047
    (HB0194 / CH0048)
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0118Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0227Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake IdentificationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0228Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0495 / CH0339
    (HB0091)
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact GrantsChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0496
    (HB0090)
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee PaymentsChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0497
    (HB0093)
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Operation License Renewal Term and Local Development Council MembershipChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0498
    (HB0092)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0518 / CH0075
    (HB0645)
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of OperationSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0663
    (HB0811)
Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation LicenseeSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0940
    (HB0377)
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Gaming (C7)
SB1006Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationSenator JenningsIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1152
    (HB1138)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational FacilitiesSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2017 12:13 P.M.