Gender

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0355 / CH0561Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0721 / CH0653
    (SB0674 / CH0654)
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for FemalesDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0761Montgomery County - Democratic Party Central Committee - Membership - Gender Requirements MC 27-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB1001
    (SB1015)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1222Maryland School Discipline Reform ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1268Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)Delegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1557
    (SB1156)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health PlansDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1648Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - DiversityDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0674 / CH0654
    (HB0721 / CH0653)
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for FemalesSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1015
    (HB1001)
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - LimitationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1156
    (HB1557)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health PlansSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.