Gender

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0013Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's SexDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0039Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - DiversityDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0062Procurement Contracts - Gender Wage Gap ReportingDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0135 / CH0064
    (SB0137 / CH0065)
Health Insurance – Coverage for Male Sterilization – High–Deductible Health PlansDelegate HillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0657
    (SB1059)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or GenderDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0902
    (SB1028 / CH0685)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Delegate CullisonIn the House - Favorable Report AdoptedHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1024 / CH0510
    (SB0986 / CH0511)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male SterilizationDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1159 / CH0154
    (SB0066 / CH0155)
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide ReportingDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1238
    (SB1203)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant ProgramDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1727Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - CoverageDelegate Miller, A.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0066 / CH0155
    (HB1159 / CH0154)
Health – Vital Statistics – Veteran and Armed Services Member Suicide ReportingSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0350 / CH0417Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0525Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory HarassmentSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0986 / CH0511
    (HB1024 / CH0510)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male SterilizationSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 511Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1028 / CH0685
    (HB0902)
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)Senator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 685Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1059
    (HB0657)
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or GenderSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB1203
    (HB1238)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:09 P.M.