General Services, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0060Commission on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center PropertyDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0144 / CH0108Procurement - Department of General Services - Exemption for Historic StructuresChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0270 / CH0386Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic SchoolsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0426 / CH0589
    (SB0311 / CH0588)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0664 / CH0033
    (SB0579 / CH0675)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0701Procurement - Lease of Property for Local Departments of Social Services - Requests for ProposalsDelegate KrimmIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0845Education - Public School Indoor Air QualityDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0846 / CH0342Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - StaffDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0878
    (SB0704)
Public Charter School Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1021 / CH0590Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1290State Government - Management of Public Buildings - Indoor Air QualityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1509Maryland Healthy Vending Choices ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0311 / CH0588
    (HB0426 / CH0589)
Promoting Efficiencies in State ProcurementPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0579 / CH0675
    (HB0664 / CH0033)
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building GroundsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 675Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0704
    (HB0878)
Public Charter School Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing canceledEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:36 A.M.