General Services, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003 / CH0627
    (SB0138)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0138
    (SB1080)
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System RequirementDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0141
    (SB0782)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0224Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and CertificationDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0597
    (SB0417)
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary WarDelegate PattersonIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0776
    (SB0492 / CH0468)
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care StudyDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0986
    (SB1009)
Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018)Delegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1556Public-Private Partnerships - Public Notice of Solicitations and Approval of AgreementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1610State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and RenovationsDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1783 / CH0014
    (SB1243)
21st Century School Facilities ActDelegate JonesGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14Appropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0138
    (HB0003 / CH0627)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0414 / CH0455Governor’s Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Resources and Data CollectionSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0417
    (HB0597)
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary WarSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0420Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise ProgramSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0492 / CH0468
    (HB0776)
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care StudySenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0782
    (HB0141)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Buildings - Diaper-Changing Facilities in RestroomsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1009
    (HB0986)
Department of General Services – Bird–Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird–Safe Buildings Act of 2018)Senator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB1080
    (HB0138)
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System RequirementSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1121Procurement - Small Businesses and Minority Businesses - Qualification and CertificationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1149Appropriations and Public–Private Partnerships – Transit Lines – Three–Station RequirementSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1243
    (HB1783 / CH0014)
21st Century School Facilities ActSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.