Genetics

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0292 / CH0431Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of SunsetChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0826Maryland Health Care Commission - Personalized Medicine - StudyDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0857 / CH0644Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived ChildDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1466Health - Genetically Modified Organisms in Food - StudyDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1523Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and ExpungementDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.