Genetics

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0680Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and ExpungementDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0906Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic TestingDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0999 / CH0106Code Revision - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1191
    (SB0778)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1341Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0654 / CH0323Health - Down Syndrome - Required InformationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0778
    (HB1191)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.