Gifts

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Elections (G1)
HB0121
    (SB0062 / CH0010)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member TermsDelegate Robinson, S.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0218State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Service Fee Exemption - Charity Selection PeriodDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0418
    (SB0691)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0450
    (SB0486 / CH0511)
Income Tax Credit - Endow MarylandDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedWays and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0569Campaign Finance - Cash Contributions - LimitDelegate HowardIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0619Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - ProhibitionDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0831 / CH0347
    (SB0846 / CH0346)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Delegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0872
    (SB0422)
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting RequirementsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0881 / CH0240
    (SB0923 / CH0256)
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana CommissionDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Health (J1)
HB1083
    (SB0670)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - GleaningDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1262
    (SB0633)
Maryland Education CreditDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1269Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1352 / CH0654
    (SB0964)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1353Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Gift Cards Purchased for Emergency PersonnelDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1401Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax CheckoffDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1521Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0062 / CH0010
    (HB0121)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Powers and Duties - Member TermsSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0422
    (HB0872)
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting RequirementsSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0486 / CH0511
    (HB0450)
Income Tax Credit - Endow MarylandSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 511Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0601 / CH0532
    (HB0741 / CH0533)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0633
    (HB1262)
Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0670
    (HB1083)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - GleaningSenator MiddletonIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0691
    (HB0418)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0809Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0846 / CH0346
    (HB0831 / CH0347)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Senator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0923 / CH0256
    (HB0881 / CH0240)
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana CommissionSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0964
    (HB1352 / CH0654)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1038Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All CountiesSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1043Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Inactive StatusSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.