Gifts

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0147 / CH0206Healthy Aging ProgramChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0234Campaign Finance - Making a Contribution During General Assembly Session - ProhibitionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0299Campaign Finance - Political Action Committees - Solicitation DisclosuresDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0303
    (SB0854)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0376Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - ProhibitionDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0472 / CH0233
    (SB0416 / CH0232)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0519Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0529Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign FinanceChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0882
    (SB0805)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersDelegate KrimmIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationEthics (G2)
HB0898Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0945Baltimore City Public Schools Vendor Contribution to Education Trust FundDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0976
    (SB0550)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Ethics (G2)
HB1317Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Regulation Reform Act of 2017 PG 310-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1363Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1422
    (SB0296)
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundDelegate Wilson, C.In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1448Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - TransactionsDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1498Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and DisclosureDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1537
    (SB1125)
Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - ExpansionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1551Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1619
    (SB1148)
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - EstablishmentDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate GainesIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0013Public Safety - State MilitiaChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0015Insurance - Charitable Gift Annuities - Special Permit Holders - Required Financial StatementsChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0130 / CH0282Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign PrincipalsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0164Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning ApplicationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0249Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Donation of Rented EquipmentSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0296
    (HB1422)
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0416 / CH0232
    (HB0472 / CH0233)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 232Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0441Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - EstablishmentSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0550
    (HB0976)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0805
    (HB0882)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0832Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0854
    (HB0303)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0948Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary TransactionsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1148
    (HB1619)
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - EstablishmentSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SJ0004
    (HJ0006)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 2:00 P.M.