Good Samaritan

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0232 / CH0412
    (SB0605 / CH0411)
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - ApprovalDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 412Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0838Civil Immunity - Emergency Care for Drug Overdose - ProtocolsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1418
    (SB0898)
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service FacilitiesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1481
    (SB0723)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical CareDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0052Immunity From Civil Liability - Forcible Entry Into Motor VehicleSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0270Courts - Forcible Entry Into Vehicle to Assist Trapped Animal - ImmunitySenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0605 / CH0411
    (HB0232 / CH0412)
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - ApprovalSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0723
    (HB1481)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical CareSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0898
    (HB1418)
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency AdministrationSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.