Gratuities

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0347
    (SB0365)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0387
    (SB0059)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Payroll Taxes on Employee TipsDelegate ConwayIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0059
    (HB0387)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Payroll Taxes on Employee TipsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0365
    (HB0347)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0371Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.