Group Homes

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0960 / CH0439
    (SB0853 / CH0438)
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and AccountsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 439Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1380
    (SB0850)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House ShelterDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1476 / CH0699
    (SB0797 / CH0698)
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated FundingDelegate JalisiEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1512
    (SB1022)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group HomesDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0102Governor's Office for Children and Services to ChildrenChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) AdoptedFinance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0797 / CH0698
    (HB1476 / CH0699)
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated FundingSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0850
    (HB1380)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House ShelterSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0853 / CH0438
    (HB0960 / CH0439)
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 438Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB1022
    (HB1512)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group HomesSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.