Guns

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and DrillsDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0029
    (SB0027)
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary ApprovalDelegate ReyIn the House - First Reading JudiciaryJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0101
    (SB0197)
Crimes - Firearms - PenaltiesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0027
    (HB0029)
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary ApprovalSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0074Criminal Law - Firearms Crimes - Bump StockSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0099Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0123Firearms - Prohibited Possession - Conviction for HarassmentSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0125Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Firearms CrimesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0126Criminal Procedure - Right of Appeal - Unlawful Possession of FirearmSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0156Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Church or Religious Organization PropertySenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0196Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Issuance With Permit to Carry, Wear, or TransportSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0197
    (HB0101)
Crimes - Firearms - PenaltiesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

January 19, 2018 1:18 P.M.