Harassment

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0189Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against EmployeesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0221Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited ActionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0396 / CH0369
    (SB1052)
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)Delegate CardinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0489 / CH0373
    (SB0504)
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - ExpansionDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0509Maryland False Claims Act of 2013Delegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0821Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0930Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0972
    (SB0567)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1324
    (SB0396)
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts VoidDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0396
    (HB1324)
Real Property - Use of Coercion, Threat, or Intimidation - Contracts VoidSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0504
    (HB0489 / CH0373)
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - ExpansionSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0567
    (HB0972)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1052
    (HB0396 / CH0369)
Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)Senator KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.