Harassment

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0017Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer ServiceDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0043 / CH0583Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge PornDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0051Public Schools - Boards of Education - Bullying Hotlines and Tip BoxesDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0064Criminal Law - Intentional Disclosure of Sexually Explicit Image of Another Person Without ConsentDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0065Criminal Law - Harassment - Penalties and Prohibition Applied to Neighborhood WatchDelegate TarrantIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0080Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0125Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited ActionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0204Crimes - Extortion of Sexually Explicit ImagesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0224Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2014Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0336Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - PenaltiesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0366Home Act of 2014Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Human Relations (D5)
HB0381
    (SB0237)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for InternsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0491Criminal Law - Intentionally Causing Emotional Distress - Distribution of Images or VideoDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0527Labor and Employment - Earned Sick LeaveDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0641 / CH0196
    (SB0803 / CH0195)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0700
    (SB0252)
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0710
    (SB0483 / CH0510)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramDelegate CullisonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0714 / CH0237
    (SB0810)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0867Maryland False Claims ActDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1108
    (SB0800 / CH0556)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for Relief and Timing of Prohibited ActionsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1143
    (SB0799)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Types of Prohibited ActionsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1208
    (SB0866)
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary OptionsDelegate SwainIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1352 / CH0654
    (SB0964)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1416Crimes - Gang-Free Zones - Penalties for Gang ActivityDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0095 / CH0128Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training, Quality Assurance, and Employee SafetyChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 128Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0219Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Correctional OfficersSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0237
    (HB0381)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for InternsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0252
    (HB0700)
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Public Hearings on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesSenator MuseIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0483 / CH0510
    (HB0710)
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0799
    (HB1143)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Types of Prohibited ActionsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0800 / CH0556
    (HB1108)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0803 / CH0195
    (HB0641 / CH0196)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Communications Between Patient or Client and Health Care Professional - Exceptions to PrivilegeSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0806Criminal Law - Hazing - PenaltySenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0810
    (HB0714 / CH0237)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0866
    (HB1208)
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary OptionsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0964
    (HB1352 / CH0654)
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable AssetsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.