Harassment

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0041Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Text Messaging Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0076 / CH0610Department of State Police - Investigation AuthorityChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0106Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society StatusDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0155 / CH0545
    (SB0278 / CH0544)
Criminal Law - StalkingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 545Judiciary
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0190
    (SB0508 / CH0679)
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee TheftDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0314 / CH0551
    (SB0346 / CH0550)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0365 / CH0262Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - UpdateDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0535 / CH0721
    (SB0734 / CH0722)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement TransfereesSpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0556Criminal Law - Threatening Juror, Witness, or Officer of Court for Performance of Duty - PenaltiesDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0759Home Act of 2016Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0825
    (SB0577)
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1104
    (SB0689)
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1175
    (SB0664)
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits ActDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1262
    (SB0829)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1396
    (SB0960)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1478Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of EmployerDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1496Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1578
    (SB0504)
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental ServicesDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1601Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate ClusterIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0278 / CH0544
    (HB0155 / CH0545)
Criminal Law - StalkingSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0346 / CH0550
    (HB0314 / CH0551)
Peace Orders - Grounds for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0504
    (HB1578)
Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Threatening to Withhold Governmental ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0508 / CH0679
    (HB0190)
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee TheftSenator RamirezEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0577
    (HB0825)
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of HarmSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0664
    (HB1175)
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0689
    (HB1104)
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0734 / CH0722
    (HB0535 / CH0721)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement TransfereesPresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0761Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0764 / CH0229Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the PressSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0829
    (HB1262)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0960
    (HB1396)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1023Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsPresidentIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.