Harassment

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0480Criminal Law - Harassment - Misuse of Interactive Computer ServiceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0669 / CH0197Public Schools - Boards of Education - Anonymous Two-Way Electronic Tip ProgramsDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0803
    (SB0900)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1037 / CH0598
    (SB0166)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1272Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1659Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of EmployerDelegate SimonaireIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHuman Relations (D5)
HB1661
    (SB1191 / CH0732)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0166
    (HB1037 / CH0598)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0900
    (HB0803)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Family Law (D4)
SB1191 / CH0732
    (HB1661)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.