Harford County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0260
    (SB0219)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Humane Society Animal ShelterDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0343
    (SB0128 / CH0181)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale for Class B LicenseesHarford County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0344
    (SB0130)
Harford County - Charitable GamingDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0345
    (SB0131 / CH0183)
Harford County Liquor Control Board - Reserve AccountHarford County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0346 / CH0031
    (SB0216 / CH0030)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0365 / CH0616Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0411
    (SB0301)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout ReservationDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0571Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Opera House RenovationsDelegate JamesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1244
    (SB0795)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1394 / CH0414
    (SB0923)
Harford County - Appointment of Fire Company Members as Deputy Sheriffs - NumberDelegate ImpallariaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1533Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation BoardDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0128 / CH0181
    (HB0343)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale for Class B LicenseesSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 181Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0129 / CH0182Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class H-CC (Corporate Club/Conference Center) LicenseSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0130
    (HB0344)
Harford County - Charitable GamingSenator GlassmanIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0131 / CH0183
    (HB0345)
Harford County Liquor Control Board - Reserve AccountSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0132Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue AccountSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0216 / CH0030
    (HB0346 / CH0031)
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0219
    (HB0260)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Humane Society Animal ShelterSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0301
    (HB0411)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout ReservationSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0795
    (HB1244)
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows BridgeSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0923
    (HB1394 / CH0414)
Harford County - Appointment of Fire Company Members as Deputy Sheriffs - NumberSenator GlassmanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.