Hazardous and Toxic Substances

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0026Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0458Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic FracturingDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0825Public Safety - Carbon Monoxide Poisoning - Portable GeneratorsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0952Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and FundDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0995Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1042Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control TechnologiesDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1158Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of ExemptionsDelegate SteinIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0107 / CH0151Public Safety - Hotels and Lodging or Rooming Houses - Carbon Monoxide AlarmsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0175Public Health - Sales Receipts Containing Bisphenol-A - ProhibitionSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0257
    (HB0381)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0458Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0859Lead - Risk Reduction Standard - Exemption for Affected PropertiesSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0892Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control TechnologiesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEnvironment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.