Hazardous and Toxic Substances

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0042Transfer of Structured Settlements - Childhood Lead Poisoning Claims - Requirements and LimitationsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0121 / CH0612
    (SB0287)
Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - VenueDelegate CarozzaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Judiciary
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0189
    (SB0348)
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and InspectionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0211 / CH0662
    (SB0198 / CH0661)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Delegate HealeyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0332
    (SB0201)
Environment - Paint Stewardship ProgramDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0394Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0396Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of ExemptionsDelegate SteinIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment (M3)
HB0535 / CH0721
    (SB0734 / CH0722)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement TransfereesSpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0796
    (SB0801)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0810
    (SB1149)
Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Fees and EnforcementDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0848Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - ProhibitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0849 / CH0175
    (SB0182 / CH0174)
Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide AlarmsDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0880Public Safety - Demolition Work - Safety Provisions and PermittingDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1060Model Residential Leases - Required ContentsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1128 / CH0501Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Drinking Water - Testing PG/MC 113-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1154
    (SB0951)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1328Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - ProhibitedDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1331Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelDelegate OaksIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1563Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - False Reports - Criminal PenaltiesDelegate CarterIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0182 / CH0174
    (HB0849 / CH0175)
Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide AlarmsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0198 / CH0661
    (HB0211 / CH0662)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Senator Nathan-PulliamEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0201
    (HB0332)
Environment - Paint Stewardship ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0287
    (HB0121 / CH0612)
Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - VenueSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0308Lead Risk Reduction Standards - Maintenance of ExemptionsSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0348
    (HB0189)
Environment - Liquid Waste Hauler - Vehicle License and InspectionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0361Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0734 / CH0722
    (HB0535 / CH0721)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement TransfereesPresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0801
    (HB0796)
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0951
    (HB1154)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1149
    (HB0810)
Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Fees and EnforcementSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial ProceedingsEnvironment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.