Hazardous and Toxic Substances

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk ReductionDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0066 / CH0385Environment - Lead and Mercury Wheel Weights - ProhibitedDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0121 / CH0375Environment - Hazardous Material Security - RepealChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0133 / CH0378Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Notification of Elevated Blood Lead LevelChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0270 / CH0386Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic SchoolsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0354
    (SB0624)
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0504 / CH0809
    (SB0713 / CH0808)
Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve SwitchesDelegate RobinsonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0597Public Health - Clean Indoor Air Act - Repeal of Exception Regarding Hotel and Motel RoomsDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0674
    (SB0168)
Maryland Paint Stewardship ProgramDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0919 / CH0679)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0830 / CH0755
    (SB0386)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 755Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1172
    (SB0400)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesDelegate Young, K.In the Senate - Hearing canceledHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1204
    (SB0932)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine StudyDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1358
    (SB0542)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1487Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - ProceduresDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1625
    (SB1195)
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0158 / CH0390Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0168
    (HB0674)
Maryland Paint Stewardship ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0386
    (HB0830 / CH0755)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionSenator Nathan-PulliamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0400
    (HB1172)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 LaboratoriesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0537Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)Senator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0542
    (HB1358)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0624
    (HB0354)
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - ProhibitionSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0713 / CH0808
    (HB0504 / CH0809)
Products That Contain Mercury - Prohibition on Sale of Electric Switches, Electric Relays, and Gas Valve SwitchesSenator YoungEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0919 / CH0679
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 679Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0932
    (HB1204)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Atrazine StudySenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB1195
    (HB1625)
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Blood Lead LevelSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.