Health Benefit Exchange

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0990
    (SB0834)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1049Voter Registration Act of 2015Delegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0471
    (HB0949)
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured MarylandersSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0556 / CH0363Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0834
    (HB0990)
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - StandardsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.