Health Benefit Exchange

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0115
    (SB0013)
Maryland Health Care Commission - Electronic Prescription Records System - Assessment and ReportDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0134
    (SB0174)
Health Insurance – Health Benefit Plan Premium Rate Review ProcessDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0660Public Health - State-Provided Health Care Benefits for State Residents (HealthcareMaryland)Delegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0726
    (SB0690)
Maryland Department of Health - Basic Health Program - ImplementationDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0994
    (SB0774)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning ServicesDelegate BarronIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1167
    (SB1011)
Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2018Delegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1312
    (SB0878)
Health Insurance - Medicaid Buy-In Task ForceDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1509Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – Individual Exchange – Copper Plans to Lower RatesDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1516
    (SB1002)
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)Delegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1527
    (SB1075)
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy ActDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1782 / CH0037Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Delegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Health and Government Operations
3/12/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1795 / CH0006Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0013
    (HB0115)
Maryland Health Care Commission – Electronic Prescription Records System – Assessment and ReportSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0054Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal LawChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0111Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax InformationChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0137 / CH0065
    (HB0135 / CH0064)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health PlansSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0174
    (HB0134)
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plan Premium Rate Review ProcessSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0387 / CH0038Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)Senator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0690
    (HB0726)
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission – Basic Health Program – StudySenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0774
    (HB0994)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning ServicesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0878
    (HB1312)
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission – Medicaid Buy–In StudySenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1002
    (HB1516)
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment (Healthy Maryland Act of 2018)Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1011
    (HB1167)
Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2018Senator FeldmanIn the Senate - Reassigned to Finance and Budget and TaxationFinance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1075
    (HB1527)
Health Insurance - Freedom of Choice of Pharmacy ActSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
SB1267 / CH0007Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 4:39 P.M.