Health Care Commission

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Ways and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0932
    (SB0379)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact StatementsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1053Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1516
    (SB0750)
Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot ProgramDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0379
    (HB0932)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and PlacementSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (40-7)Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0750
    (HB1516)
Public Health - Health Record and Payment Clearing House - Pilot ProgramSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1020Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017Senator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.