Health Maintenance Organizations

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0169Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming ProvisionsDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0298 / CH0263
    (SB0335)
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model ContractSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Health and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0437
    (SB0416 / CH0163)
Health Maintenance Organizations - Payments to Nonparticipating Providers - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0625 / CH0068
    (SB0641 / CH0067)
Kathleen A. Mathias Oral Chemotherapy Improvement Act of 2014Delegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0693 / CH0610
    (SB0504)
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental BenefitsDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0709
    (SB0642)
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Termination DateDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0761 / CH0422
    (SB0874)
Health Insurance - Specialty DrugsDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0779 / CH0614Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Care Provider-Carrier WorkgroupDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0823
    (SB0893 / CH0355)
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and ClarificationChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0851Health Insurance - Biometric Health Care Identification CardsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1127
    (SB0884 / CH0204)
Health Insurance - Incentives for Health Care PractitionersDelegate TarrantVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1130
    (SB1002)
Health Insurance - Uniform Claims Form - Electronic Submission by InsuredDelegate ZuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1229Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance MarketplaceDelegate HoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1233 / CH0317
    (SB0622 / CH0316)
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First ProtocolDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1235 / CH0449Community Integrated Medical Home ProgramDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1336Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Enrollment of Individuals - InformationDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1456 / CH0457Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - JurisdictionChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0096 / CH0023Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care ActChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 23Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0416 / CH0163
    (HB0437)
Health Maintenance Organizations - Payments to Nonparticipating Providers - Repeal of Termination DateSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0504
    (HB0693 / CH0610)
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental BenefitsSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0622 / CH0316
    (HB1233 / CH0317)
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First ProtocolSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0641 / CH0067
    (HB0625 / CH0068)
Kathleen A. Mathias Oral Chemotherapy Improvement Act of 2014Senator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0642
    (HB0709)
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Reporting Requirement and Termination DateSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0671Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - RequiredSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0790 / CH0072Health Insurance - Communications Between Carriers and Enrollees - Conformity With the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act (HIPAA)Senator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0874
    (HB0761 / CH0422)
Health Insurance - Specialty DrugsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0884 / CH0204
    (HB1127)
Health Insurance - Incentives for Health Care PractitionersSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0893 / CH0355
    (HB0823)
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and ClarificationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1002
    (HB1130)
Health Insurance - Uniform Claims Form - Electronic Submission by InsuredSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1016Maryland Kinesiology ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.