Health Maintenance Organizations

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0063Health Care Practitioners - Cost Estimate Notice - RequiredDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0298 / CH0219Health Insurance - Licensed Clinical Professional Art Therapists - ReimbursementDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0613 / CH0820
    (SB0363 / CH0821)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingDelegate HettlemanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0667Health Insurance - Coverage for Lymphedema Diagnosis, Evaluation, and TreatmentDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0675 / CH0676
    (SB0061 / CH0677)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital TomosynthesisDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0730 / CH0227Health Insurance - Coverage for Diabetes Test Strips - Prohibition on Deductible, Copayment, and CoinsuranceDelegate HillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 227Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0919 / CH0679)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0786 / CH0583Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - EstablishmentDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 583Ways and Means
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0876
    (SB0918)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilityDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0887 / CH0581Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Drug Products to Treat an Opioid Use Disorder - ProhibitionDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 581Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1103
    (SB1055)
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy ServicesDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1117Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs - Authority to DispenseDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1128
    (SB0768)
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Formulary ChangesDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1147 / CH0766
    (SB0898 / CH0767)
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing SynchronizationDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 766Health and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1212Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Opioid Antagonists - AuthorizationDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1643Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for PregnancyDelegate LamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0061 / CH0677
    (HB0675 / CH0676)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital TomosynthesisSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 677Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0096Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based MethodsSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0363 / CH0821
    (HB0613 / CH0820)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0768
    (HB1128)
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Formulary ChangesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0898 / CH0767
    (HB1147 / CH0766)
Health Insurance - Prescription Drugs - Dispensing SynchronizationSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 767Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0918
    (HB0876)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilitySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0919 / CH0679
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
President Jimmy Carter Cancer Treatment Access ActSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 679Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0968
    (HB1127 / CH0579)
Health Insurance - Coverage Requirements for Behavioral Health Disorders - ModificationsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1055
    (HB1103)
Health Insurance and Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement for and Provision of Pharmacy ServicesSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.