Health Services Cost Review Commission

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0189Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0932
    (SB0379)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact StatementsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1329
    (SB0967)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate BromwellIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0379
    (HB0932)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and PlacementSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (40-7)Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0476
    (HB0580)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0967
    (HB1329)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Senator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1020Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017Senator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2017 12:14 P.M.