Heating and Cooling

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0394
    (SB0024)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Weinberg Center HVAC ProjectDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0636
    (SB0154)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0024
    (HB0394)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Weinberg Center HVAC ProjectSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0154
    (HB0636)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0826Energy Efficiency Programs - Transferring Development to the Maryland Energy AdministrationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0864 / CH0203State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Cease and Desist Orders - AuthoritySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 203Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.