Higher Education Commission

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007 / CH0346Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - ModificationsDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0526 / CH0374Higher Education - Maryland First Scholarship - Creation and FundingDelegate SummersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
HB0553Higher Education - Program Proposals - Review and ObjectionsChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0739Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - ReportingDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Higher Education (F2)
HB0813 / CH0392Task Force to Study the Impact of Expanding Credit and Noncredit Courses for Students with Intellectual and Developmental DisabilitiesDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 392Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0833
    (SB0740 / CH0533)
College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013Delegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0963 / CH0395Edward T. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship ProgramsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1168
    (SB0548 / CH0286)
Education - Minority Teacher Recruitment - Study and ReportDelegate HixsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1272
    (SB0964)
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of RightsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0054 / CH0172Maryland Higher Education Commission - Scholarship Funds - Technical AlterationsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 172Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0055 / CH0009Private Career Schools - Solicitor Permits - RepealChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 9Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0063 / CH0014Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational InstitutionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0111Education - General Assembly Scholarships - Modification of ProgramsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0153 / CH0024Higher Education - Academic Credit for Military Education, Training, and ExperienceSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 24Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0341Higher Education - Academic Program Action - Repeal of Application Fees and ReportSenator MadalenoIn the House - Rereferred to AppropriationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0510 / CH0490Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education Programs - RegulationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0548 / CH0286
    (HB1168)
Education - Minority Teacher Recruitment - Study and ReportSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 286Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0587 / CH0503Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member ScholarshipSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0740 / CH0533
    (HB0833)
College and Career Readiness and College Completion Act of 2013Senator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0812Tuition Cap and College Opportunity Act of 2013Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Higher Education (F2)
SB0964
    (HB1272)
Maryland College Sports Fans and Athletes Bill of RightsSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHigher Education (F2)
SJ0001International Education - SupportSenator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.