Highway Administration, State

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0118
    (SB0202)
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk ClosureDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0132 / CH0614State Government - Pollinator Habitat PlansDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0234State Highways - Electronic Map of State Roads by State Legislative DistrictDelegate GrammerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0253 / CH0257
    (SB0309)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0442
    (SB0303)
Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway IntersectionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0854 / CH0281State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water or Sewer Lines - Cost SharingDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0961
    (SB0955)
Federal-Aid Primary Highways - SignsDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1562
    (SB1099)
State Highway Administration - Watkins Mill Road Interchange ProjectDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1598
    (SB1120)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueDelegate ParrottIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1624 / CH0526
    (SB1104 / CH0525)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayDelegate ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Environment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0202
    (HB0118)
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk ClosureSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0213State Police - Speed Camera Revenue - Enforcement ActivitiesSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0303
    (HB0442)
Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway IntersectionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0309
    (HB0253 / CH0257)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0318Department of Transportation - Heads of Modal Administrations - Senate ConfirmationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0405State Highway Administration - Service Signs - Business or Attraction Located in Shopping CenterSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0573
    (HB0698)
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State HighwaysSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0596Transportation - Installation of Brick Security Mailboxes Within Rights-of-WaySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0616State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0617Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming RightsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0718State Highway Administration - Acquisition of Property - Real Estate AppraisersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0752State Highway Administration - Policy Concerning Sound Barriers Along HighwaysSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0955
    (HB0961)
Federal-Aid Primary Highways - SignsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB1099
    (HB1562)
State Highway Administration - Watkins Mill Road Interchange ProjectSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1104 / CH0525
    (HB1624 / CH0526)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1120
    (HB1598)
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing PlaqueSenator ReillyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.