Highway Administration, State

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004 / CH0020Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton BridgeDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0054
    (SB0024 / CH0223)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersDelegate LamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0330 / CH0174
    (SB0215 / CH0175)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0465 / CH0086Vehicle Laws - Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0515 / CH0246Agriculture – Palmer Amaranth – StudyDelegate GhristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0744 / CH0717
    (SB0850 / CH0718)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 717Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0959Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid BeaconsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0961 / CH0176Rural Broadband Communication ServicesDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0977State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification ActDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1139Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – EnforcementDelegate LiermanIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1281State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public AccessDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1380State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation ActivityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1406
    (SB0872 / CH0325)
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester CountyDelegate CarozzaIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1412Vehicle Laws - High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Hours of Operation on U.S. Route 50Delegate SaabIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1771Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Low Speed Electric Vehicles – City of Havre de GraceDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0024 / CH0223
    (HB0054)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0055Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate HighwaysSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0215 / CH0175
    (HB0330 / CH0174)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Town of ViennaSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0850 / CH0718
    (HB0744 / CH0717)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 718Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0872 / CH0325
    (HB1406)
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester CountySenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0906Construction of a Highway or County Road - Commercial Property - Access RoadsSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.