Holidays and Special Dates

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0045General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions DayDelegate MorhaimIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayDelegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0389
    (SB0455)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DayDelegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0409Election Law - Primary Elections and Early Voting - DatesDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0572
    (SB0400)
State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness MonthDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0746 / CH0170
    (SB0422 / CH0169)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage DayDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0849
    (SB0486)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act)Delegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1118 / CH0001
    (SB0080 / CH0002)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans DayDelegate Wilson, C.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0080 / CH0002
    (HB1118 / CH0001)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans DaySenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0180General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions DaySenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0260General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans DaySenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0400
    (HB0572)
State Government - Commemorative Months - Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness MonthSenator PughIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0422 / CH0169
    (HB0746 / CH0170)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - South Asian American Heritage DaySenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 169Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0455
    (HB0389)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DaySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0486
    (HB0849)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Public School Holidays - References in Official Publications (Public School Holiday Protection Act)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0889
    (HB0340 / CH0241)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DaySenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.