Holidays and Special Dates

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0091 / CH0389
    (SB0442 / CH0388)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions DayDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Health and Government Operations
2/3/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0270
    (SB0594)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship MonthDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0614General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's DayDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0620Elementary and Secondary Education - Required Number of School Days - RepealDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0626Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' DayDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0638General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' DayDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0660General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian DayDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0915
    (SB0837)
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - HolidaysDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0996Education - Public School Holidays - Easter MondayDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1174
    (SB0353)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Fred Korematsu DayDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1216General Provisions - Commemorative Days - K9 Veterans DayDelegate ChangIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1319
    (SB0620 / CH0415)
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness WeekDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1349
    (SB0767)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DayDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1595Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - HolidaysDelegate Howard, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HJ0005Public Schools - Post-Labor Day Start DateDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0269Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' DaySenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0353
    (HB1174)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Fred Korematsu DaySenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0442 / CH0388
    (HB0091 / CH0389)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - National Healthcare Decisions DaySenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0594
    (HB0270)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship MonthSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0620 / CH0415
    (HB1319)
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness WeekSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0767
    (HB1349)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DaySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.