Holidays and Special Dates

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian DayDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0020General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' DayDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0029Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - HolidaysDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0057General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's DayDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0324
    (SB0580 / CH0680)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveDelegate KormanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0400Education - Public School Holidays - Presidents' Day and Easter MondayDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0560 / CH0130Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale MC 8-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0576
    (SB0603)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship MonthDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0841General Provisions - Commemorative Days - International Gang Awareness DayDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1314 / CH0400Crabs - Harvest Times - HolidaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1412Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' Day and Easter MondayDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1462State Designations - Henrietta Lacks DayDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1657
    (SB1166)
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural EventDelegate RosenbergIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HJ0001
    (SJ0001)
National Day of the CowboyDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0092General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Brain Cancer Awareness DaySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0580 / CH0680
    (HB0324)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0603
    (HB0576)
General Provisions - Commemorative Months - Maryland Sportsmanship MonthSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0636 / CH0478Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1166
    (HB1657)
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural EventSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1193Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of OperationAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SJ0001
    (HJ0001)
National Day of the CowboySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.