Home Care Services

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1006
    (SB0572)
Hospitals - Designation of CaregiversDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1172 / CH0470Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - LicensesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0297 / CH0155Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term SupportsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0563 / CH0364Developmental Disabilities Administration and Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services - Military FamiliesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 364Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0572
    (HB1006)
Hospitals - Designation of CaregiversSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0596 / CH0041Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External ReviewsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.