Home Care Services

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0265Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0730 / CH0075
    (SB0549 / CH0074)
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination DateDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 75Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1235
    (SB0895)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills ChecklistDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1277 / CH0377
    (SB0336 / CH0376)
Hospitals - Designation of Lay CaregiversDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0334Health Insurance - Access to Accurate Provider DirectoriesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0336 / CH0376
    (HB1277 / CH0377)
Hospitals - Designation of Lay CaregiversSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 376Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0413
    (HB1499)
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Crisis Resolution and Prevention Resolution Services - Funding and ReportingSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Health (J1)
SB0549 / CH0074
    (HB0730 / CH0075)
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Membership and Extension of Termination DateSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 74Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0895
    (HB1235)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Nursing Services - Skills ChecklistSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.