Homeowners Associations

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023
    (SB0176)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special AssessmentsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0078
    (SB0160)
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable PresumptionDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0286 / CH0449
    (SB0161 / CH0448)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0576
    (SB0794)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0618Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0811Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership CommunitiesDelegate NiemannIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1194
    (SB0947 / CH0077)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.Delegate ImpallariaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1532
    (SB1062)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's FeesDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0136Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners AssociationsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
1/30/2013 - 2:45 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0160
    (HB0078)
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable PresumptionSenator FroshIn the House - Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0161 / CH0448
    (HB0286 / CH0449)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0162Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Transition of Control - Termination of ContractsSenator KelleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0176
    (HB0023)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Contracts for Resale - Notice of Potential Special AssessmentsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0794
    (HB0576)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB0947 / CH0077
    (HB1194)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Bowerman-Loreley Beach Community Association, Inc.Senator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0985Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Public Nuisance SuitsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1062
    (HB1532)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Attorney's FeesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.