Homicide

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0157 / CH0518Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0735
    (SB0763)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0874Criminal Procedure - Homicide Investigations - Procedures (Joseph's Law)Delegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0974Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's LicenseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1342
    (SB0945 / CH0512)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Delegate KramerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0160 / CH0517Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0763
    (HB0735)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0945 / CH0512
    (HB1342)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Senator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.