Hospices

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0056
    (SB0063)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0104 / CH0474Medical Cannabis - Written Certifications - Certifying ProvidersDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Health and Government Operations
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB0255Correctional Services - Medical Parole - Approval of GovernorDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0416
    (SB0873)
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational BookletDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0437 / CH0147
    (SB0537)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0456
    (SB0382)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0568Health Occupations - Health Care Practitioners - Exemption From Participation in Aid in DyingDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0624Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Hospice House of Charles CountyCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0905
    (SB1102)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Montgomery Hospice Casey HouseDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0063
    (HB0056)
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try ActSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0382
    (HB0456)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0537
    (HB0437 / CH0147)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - ModificationsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0743Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Doey's HouseSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0873
    (HB0416)
Health Care Decisions Act - End-of-Life Decision-Making Informational BookletSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1102
    (HB0905)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Montgomery Hospice Casey HouseSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.