Hospitals

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0041Hospitals - Community Benefit Report - Disclosure of Tax ExemptionsDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0161
    (SB0187)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0499Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - ModificationDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0562
    (SB0530)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0614
    (SB0390)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and PlacementDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0681Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0847Health Insurance - Coverage for Lymphedema Diagnosis, Evaluation, and TreatmentDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0908
    (SB0271)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilityDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0909
    (SB0862)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1113Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi SyndromeDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1193Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and EffectsDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1461Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act)Delegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1483Duties of a Guardian of the Person – Petition for VisitationDelegate SaabIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1501Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat RequirementsDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1505Health - Psychiatric Hospitals - Units Licensed as Assisted Living FacilitiesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1540Health Care Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public NoticeDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1541
    (SB0994)
Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit HospitalsDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1621Department of Commerce - Harford Memorial Hospital Closure - Economic Impact StudyDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1655Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality ProtectionsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1768Hospitals - Discharge of Patients - ProceduresDelegate HayesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0052Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Conformity to Federal LawChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Health and Government OperationsFinance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0169Public Health - Prescription Drug and Medical Supply Access and Affordability WorkgroupSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0187
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0271
    (HB0908)
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic InfertilitySenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading Health and Government OperationsFinance
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0390
    (HB0614)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and PlacementSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0476Dispensing of Naloxone - Hospital Emergency Departments - Registered NursesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0527Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - ModificationSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0530
    (HB0562)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0682Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Emergency Medical Services Providers - Coverage and Reimbursement of ServicesSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0862
    (HB0909)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0975Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic DiseaseSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0981Hospitals - Discharge of Patients - Emergency Medical Conditions and Extreme Temperatures (Rebecca's Law)Senator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0994
    (HB1541)
Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit HospitalsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

February 23, 2018 9:48 A.M.