Hotels and Motels

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0074
    (SB0260)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0275 / CH0461
    (SB0349 / CH0460)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Wicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0335 / CH0574
    (SB0900 / CH0573)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsDelegate MitchellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0469
    (SB0018)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Delegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0649 / CH0130Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0672 / CH0133Montgomery County - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder - Class H Licenses MC 17-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 133Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0749 / CH0387
    (SB0767)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0815
    (SB0631 / CH0510)
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training CenterDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0816 / CH0070
    (SB0629 / CH0069)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0913Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax RateDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1034Creation of a State Debt - Charlestown - Cecil Inn RenovationsDelegate RudolphIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1081 / CH0666Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Permit - Class BH Licensees PG 301-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 666Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1395Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate JamesIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB1413 / CH0595
    (SB0969 / CH0594)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0018
    (HB0469)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0260
    (HB0074)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0349 / CH0460
    (HB0275 / CH0461)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Senator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0449Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2013Senator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0629 / CH0069
    (HB0816 / CH0070)
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and ConsumptionSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0631 / CH0510
    (HB0815)
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training CenterSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0767
    (HB0749 / CH0387)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0900 / CH0573
    (HB0335 / CH0574)
Baltimore City - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development ProjectsSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0969 / CH0594
    (HB1413 / CH0595)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 594Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.