Hotels and Motels

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0137 / CH0097Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of RestrictionCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0183Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0299
    (SB0130 / CH0050)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft BeerDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0334Criminal Law - Marijuana Consumption in Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0601
    (SB0466)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - RateFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0717
    (SB0530 / CH0072)
Dorchester County - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Minimum Seating RequirementDorchester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0841 / CH0126
    (SB0693)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby LicenseFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1069 / CH0293Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Facility Licenses PG 311-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1072 / CH0591
    (SB0879 / CH0590)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Various LicensesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1074 / CH0294Montgomery County - Laytonsville - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 22-16Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1269
    (SB0223)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1304
    (SB1036)
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - PenaltyDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1361
    (SB0776)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1472Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016Delegate BranchIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1550
    (SB1079 / CH0605)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel LicensesWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1580Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0033
    (HB0642 / CH0110)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0130 / CH0050
    (HB0299)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft BeerSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0223
    (HB1269)
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and RemediesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0466
    (HB0601)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - RateSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
SB0530 / CH0072
    (HB0717)
Dorchester County - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Minimum Seating RequirementSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 72Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0693
    (HB0841 / CH0126)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby LicenseSenator YoungVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0776
    (HB1361)
Hotel Rental Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Limited Residential LodgingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0879 / CH0590
    (HB1072 / CH0591)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Various LicensesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0958 / CH0454
    (HB1071 / CH0455)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1036
    (HB1304)
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - PenaltySenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1079 / CH0605
    (HB1550)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel LicensesWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 605Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1129Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Hotel and Special Hotel Concessionaire LicensesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.