Housing and Community Development, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0045
    (SB0337)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0108 / CH0082Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood and Community Assistance Program - Project ProposalsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 82Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0192
    (SB0156)
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program FundDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0389Lead Safe Income Tax CreditDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0823 / CH0545
    (SB0764 / CH0544)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless YouthDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsChildren (O4)
HB0957 / CH0657Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with DisabilitiesDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 657Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1170 / CH0593
    (SB0965 / CH0592)
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund WorkgroupDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1489
    (SB0935)
Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction FinancingDelegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0060 / CH0011Community Development Administration - Residential Mortgage Loans - Financial Assistance for Families of Limited IncomeChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0062 / CH0013Community Legacy Program - Application Requirements - Approval by Authorized DesigneeChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 13Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0156
    (HB0192)
Courts - Service of Process - Increase in Sheriff's Fees - Distribution to Rental Allowance Program FundSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0337
    (HB0045)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0764 / CH0544
    (HB0823 / CH0545)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless YouthSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0935
    (HB1489)
Housing - Energy-Efficient and Green Homes - Construction FinancingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0965 / CH0592
    (HB1170 / CH0593)
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund WorkgroupSenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.