Howard County

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0621
    (SB0040)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-16Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0631 / CH0493Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0632 / CH0622Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Luxury Restaurants and Farm Breweries - Licenses Ho. Co. 14-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0650
    (SB0609)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0651
    (SB0610)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - South Branch Park Ho. Co. 3-16Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0652
    (SB0611)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Huntington Park Ho. Co. 4-16Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0653
    (SB0613)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 6-16Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0654 / CH0625Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 10-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0655 / CH0272Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Licenses Ho. Co. 7-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 272Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0656
    (SB0612)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Solomon's Lodge #121 Ho. Co. 5-16Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0671 / CH0626Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0709 / CH0672
    (SB0422 / CH0671)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1090 / CH0130
    (SB0670)
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 15-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1105 / CH0132Howard County Public School System - Access to Public Information Ho. Co. 9-16Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 132Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0040
    (HB0621)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-16Senator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0422 / CH0671
    (HB0709 / CH0672)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0609
    (HB0650)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0610
    (HB0651)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - South Branch Park Ho. Co. 3-16Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0611
    (HB0652)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Huntington Park Ho. Co. 4-16Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0612
    (HB0656)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Solomon's Lodge #121 Ho. Co. 5-16Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0613
    (HB0653)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 6-16Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0670
    (HB1090 / CH0130)
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community LicenseSenator KasemeyerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.