Howard County

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0061
    (SB0534)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Harriet Tubman Community Center and Museum Ho. Co. 4-18Delegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0223 / CH0138Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0337
    (SB0640)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 1-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0338
    (SB0641)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Public Arts Project Ho. Co. 2–18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0339
    (SB0535)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Lisbon Volunteer Fire Department Ho. Co. 5-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0340 / CH0811Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18Howard County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 811Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0341
    (SB0642)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Gateway Innovation Center Ho. Co. 3-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0342Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C BWL License Ho. Co. 21-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0343
    (SB0537)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Ellicott City Baltimore and Ohio Railroad Station Museum Ho. Co. 22-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0397
    (SB0536)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Barnard Fort House Ho. Co. 23-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0809 / CH0829Howard County - Sheriff's Salary Ho. Co. 8-18Howard County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1053 / CH0139Howard County – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License and Multiple Class B and Class BLX Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 06–18Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1115 / CH0837Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18Howard County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1116 / CH0493
    (SB1152)
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit ExemptionCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1180 / CH0140Howard County Student Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Teachers Ho. Co. 14–18Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1186 / CH0141Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Natural Disaster Ho. Co. 09-18Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1324Howard County Board of Education - Superintendent of Schools - Term Length Ho. Co. 11-18Howard County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1325 / CH0142Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C License and Class C and Class D Per Diem Entertainment Venue Licenses Ho. Co. 20-18Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 142Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1408Historic Ellicott City Workgroup on Preservation and FloodingDelegate FlanaganIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1485 / CH0531Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf OwnersDelegate FisherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0534
    (HB0061)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Harriet Tubman Community Center and Museum Ho. Co. 4-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0535
    (HB0339)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Lisbon Volunteer Fire Department Ho. Co. 5-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0536
    (HB0397)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Barnard Fort House Ho. Co. 23–18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0537
    (HB0343)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Baltimore and Ohio Railroad Station Museum Ho. Co. 22–18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0640
    (HB0337)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 1-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0641
    (HB0338)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Public Arts Project Ho. Co. 2-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0642
    (HB0341)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Gateway Innovation Center Ho. Co. 3-18Howard County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0998State Department of Education - REAL School Gardens Pilot Program - EstablishedSenator PetersIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1152
    (HB1116 / CH0493)
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit ExemptionCarroll County SenatorsIn the House - Rereferred to Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.