Human Rights

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0933 / CH0653Crimes - Human Trafficking of Minor - Defense of Ignorance of Victim's AgeDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1056Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and AwarenessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1188
    (SB0215)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Delegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1427State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0215
    (HB1188)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Senator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0654Criminal Law - Safe Harbor for Minors Act of 2013Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.