Human Rights

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0101Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Related Crimes - PenaltiesDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0173Commission on the Solemn Remembrance of the Victims of LynchingDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0219
    (SB0527)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - PenaltyDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0263Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public ParticipationDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0292Police Training Commission - Training Requirements - Human TraffickingDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0519
    (SB0903)
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights AbusesDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0587
    (SB0661)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0623
    (SB0866)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking VictimDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0782
    (SB0665)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0786 / CH0081
    (SB0863 / CH0080)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Sunset ExtensionDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0811Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human TraffickingDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1089
    (SB0865)
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - FineDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1273Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1484
    (SB0015)
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting RequirementsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0015
    (HB1484)
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting RequirementsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0380
    (HB0458)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0527
    (HB0219)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - PenaltySenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0661
    (HB0587)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0665
    (HB0782)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0863 / CH0080
    (HB0786 / CH0081)
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Sunset ExtensionSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0865
    (HB1089)
Criminal Law - Solicitation for Prostitution - FineSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0866
    (HB0623)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking VictimSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0869Governor's Office of Minority Affairs - Workgroup on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0903
    (HB0519)
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights AbusesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1023Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1084Adult Entertainment Establishments - National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline Information - Sign Posting RequirementsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.