Human Resources, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0245 / CH0090Family Law - Substance-Exposed NewbornsChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0333 / CH0367Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0662Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on PayoutsDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB0834Human Services - Public Assistance - Mandatory Drug TestsDelegate StocksdaleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB0884
    (SB0686 / CH0526)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1086
    (SB0576)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Delegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1125
    (SB0388)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1137
    (SB0898)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1333Family Investment Program - Family Literacy Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1518Pension and Retirement Health Benefits - Child Support Enforcement Administration Employees - Transferees from Baltimore City State's Attorney's OfficeDelegate ClippingerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0071Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement PlansChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0083 / CH0178Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access PointChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0181Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support ObligationChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0388
    (HB1125)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0442Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of UnderstandingSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0576
    (HB1086)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0686 / CH0526
    (HB0884)
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot ProgramSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0802Department of Human Resources - Adoption Awareness ProgramSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0888
    (HB0955 / CH0394)
Task Force to Study Temporary Disability Insurance Programs and the Process for Assisting Individuals with Disabilities at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator GaragiolaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0898
    (HB1137)
Task Force to Study the Process for Assisting Cancer Patients at Local Departments of Social ServicesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.