Human Resources, Department of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0066Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0199Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement AgencyCharles County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0386 / CH0245Child Abuse and Neglect - Centralized Confidential DatabaseDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0439
    (SB0685 / CH0046)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0460 / CH0422Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and ExtensionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0575
    (SB0524)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0643
    (SB0567 / CH0366)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsChildren (O4)
HB0852 / CH0460Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Best Practices and ModelsDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0856
    (SB0571)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB10302-1-1 Maryland - Procurement of Services to Operate a Public Information Telephone Line or HotlineDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1049Voter Registration Act of 2015Delegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1196
    (SB0832)
Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination ProcessDelegate KellyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0524
    (HB0575)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0567 / CH0366
    (HB0643)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0571
    (HB0856)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and TrainingSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0685 / CH0046
    (HB0439)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0832
    (HB1196)
Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination ProcessSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.