Hunting

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0038Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Applicant QualificationsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0066 / CH0433
    (SB0002 / CH0432)
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - SundaysDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0214 / CH0357Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 357Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0272
    (SB0041)
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0273
    (SB0089)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0276Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Use of Rifles Frederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0365 / CH0616Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0366Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0367Hunting - Deer Firearms Season - January DaysDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0368Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0369Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season - January DaysDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0499Natural Resources - Deer Bow Hunting Season - End DateDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0505Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security NumberDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0514Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of InformationDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0543 / CH0618Carroll County - Deer Hunting - SundaysCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0584
    (SB0204)
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0612
    (SB0787)
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0671Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 2-13Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0812Hunting - Certificate of Competency and Safety - Veterans and Active Duty MilitaryDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0990Garrett County - Deer Hunting - Three-Point RuleDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1482 / CH0601
    (SB1031 / CH0600)
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited ActsDelegate CaneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 601Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0002 / CH0432
    (HB0066 / CH0433)
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - SundaysSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0024Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0041
    (HB0272)
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0089
    (HB0273)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0204
    (HB0584)
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0619Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013Senator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0650Natural Resources - Hunting License Applications - Social Security NumberSenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0754Hunting - Schools - Expanded Safety ZoneSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial ProceedingsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0787
    (HB0612)
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1031 / CH0600
    (HB1482 / CH0601)
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited ActsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 600Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.